MA S2293 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2361
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to special police officers in the town of West Bridgewater. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to special police officers in the town of West Bridgewater
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2361 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-07-18 | House | House concurred |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
S2361 (Replaced by) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2020
S219 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2265 (Similar To) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2020
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
S2361 (Replaced by) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2020
S219 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2430 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2293 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2293.pdf |