MA S2307 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the City Council of the city of Somerville to appoint a clerk of committees and assistant clerks of committees. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the City Council of the city of Somerville to appoint a clerk of committees and assistant clerks of committees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2020-05-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2019-12-02 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-08-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-08-08 | House | House concurred |
2019-08-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H2423 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2350 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3641 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3645 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2423 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2350 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3641 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3645 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2307 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2307.pdf |