MA S2323 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2543
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to assessment of surcharge points. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to assessment of surcharge points
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2543 |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-08-19 | House | House concurred |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S254 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1017 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S296 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S277 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1017 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S296 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S277 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2323 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2323.pdf |