MA S2337 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to extend veterans retirement buyback opportunities. Public Service.
Title
To extend veterans retirement buyback opportunities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-09-12 | House | House concurred |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H4158 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4666
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H4158 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4666
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2337 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2337.pdf |