MA S2340 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to health insurance benefits for state employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to health insurance benefits for state employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-09-16 | House | House concurred |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H638 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2340 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2340.pdf |