MA S242 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to accelerate student success through expanded learning time. Education.
Title
To accelerate student success through expanded learning time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-04-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1310 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H821 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4229
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S997 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3354 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S377 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2022 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H2069 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4193 (Similar To) 2020-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2020
S2426 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H821 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4229
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S997 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3354 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S377 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2022 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H2069 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4193 (Similar To) 2020-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 174 of the Acts of 2020
S2426 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S242 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S242.pdf |