MA S2424 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2663
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to childless individuals with chronic disabilities experiencing homelessness. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to childless individuals with chronic disabilities experiencing homelessness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2663 |
2020-01-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-11-26 | House | House concurred |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2043 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - New draft substituted, see S2555
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2674
H130 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4490
S2663 (Replaced by) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2043 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - New draft substituted, see S2555
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2674
H130 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4490
S2663 (Replaced by) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2424 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2424.pdf |