MA S2458 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2807
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - New draft substituted, see S2807
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - New draft substituted, see S2807
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter for the town of Walpole. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter for the town of Walpole
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] |
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2807 |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Read third |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-01-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2807 (Replaced by) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2458.pdf |