MA S2468 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to revoke the town of Longmeadow’s acceptance of a certain general law establishing a board of election commissioners. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Revoking the town of Longmeadow’s acceptance of a certain general law establishing a board of election commissioners
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-03-17 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-01-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2468 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2468.pdf |