MA S247 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2593
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of Native American mascots by public schools in the Commonwealth. Education.
Title
Prohibiting the use of Native American mascots by public schools in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2593 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H443 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2593
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2593 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H443 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2593
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2593 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S247.pdf |