MA S2596 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 323 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 323 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Berkley to grant an additional license for the sale of alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Berkley to grant an additional license for the sale alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 323 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-10 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-03 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-11-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-11-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-11-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-10-25 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-10-04 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2018-08-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/07/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-07-12 | House | House concurred |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H176 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H145 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1977 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2051 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
S2687 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - House concurred
H145 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1977 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2051 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
S2687 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2596 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2596.pdf |