MA S2652 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4664
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to preventing price gouging during an emergency. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to preventing price gouging during an emergency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Accompanied by H4664 |
2020-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-08 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2020 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2020 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Remote |
2020-04-23 | House | House concurred |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4664 (Replaces) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied S2652
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2652 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2652.pdf |