MA S2700 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide liability protections for contractors, sub-contractors and unions during the COVID-19 Pandemic. The Judiciary.
Title
To provide liability protections for contractors, sub-contractors and unions during the COVID-19 Pandemic
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
Rep. Christine Barber [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-22 | House | House concurred |
2020-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-05-11 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2700 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2700.pdf |