MA S2701 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2882
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-2)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to emergency paid sick time. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to emergency paid sick time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2882 |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 3, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-05-11 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2882 (Replaced by) 2020-08-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2701 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2701.pdf |