MA S2717 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1134
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to supervised injection facilities,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2717). (Representatives Scaccia of Boston, Whipps of Athol, Crocker of Barnstable and Sullivan of Abington dissenting)
Title
Relative to preventing overdose deaths and increasing access to treatment
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery | Sen. Joseph Boncore [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-05-21 | Senate | New draft of S1134 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1134 (Replaces) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2717
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2717 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2717.pdf |