MA S2767 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1276
Note: Legislation replaced by S2931
Note: Legislation replaced by S2931
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1-1)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - New draft substituted, see S2931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - New draft substituted, see S2931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure safe patient access to emergency care, reports recommending that the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2767) ought to pass.
Title
Ensuring safe patient access to emergency care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2931 |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Read second |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2931 |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-06-18 | Senate | New draft of S1276 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1276 (Replaces) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2767
S2931 (Replaced by) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
S2931 (Replaced by) 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2767 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2767.pdf |