MA S2784 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2972
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - New draft substituted, see S2972
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - New draft substituted, see S2972
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the permanent protection and stewardship of the historic Lampson Brook Farm in Belchertown. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing for the permanent protection and stewardship of the historic Lampson Brook Farm in Belchertown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2972 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Read second |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2972 |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | House | House concurred |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2972 (Replaced by) 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2784 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2784.pdf |