MA S2831 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2918
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to guarantee housing stability during the COVID-19 emergency and recovery. Housing.
Title
To guarantee housing stability during the COVID-19 emergency and recovery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2918 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday October 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-07-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2020 from 09:00 AM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-07-20 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2918 (Replaced by) 2020-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2831 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2831.pdf |