MA S2871 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4979
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Accompanied H4979
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Accompanied H4979
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to source plasma donation centers. Public Health.
Title
Relative to source plasma donation centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Accompanied H4979 |
2020-10-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-10-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Saturday October 17, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday October 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-07-30 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H4979 (Replaced by) 2020-10-19 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2871 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2871.pdf |