MA S2924 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H5198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H5198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the imposition of an excise tax to provide for climate change adaptation infrastructure and affordable housing investments in the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Providing for climate change adaptation infrastructure and affordable housing investments in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5198 |
2020-11-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-11-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2020 from 11:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-10-15 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H5198 (Replaced by) 2020-12-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2924 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2924.pdf |