MA S2945 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve establishing a commission on the two hundred and fiftieth anniversary of the American Revolution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing a commission on the two hundred and fiftieth anniversary of the American Revolution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-06HouseEnacted
2021-01-05HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-01-05HouseRules suspended
2021-01-05HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2021-01-05HouseRules suspended
2021-01-05HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-01-05HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-11-10HouseReferred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2020-11-09SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-11-09SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-11-09SenateSubstituted as a new draft for S2452
2020-11-09SenateRecommended new draft for S2452
2020-11-09SenateReported from the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback