MA S308 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to equity in education funding. Education.
Title
Relative to equity in education funding
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-03-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S226 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2365 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Reported by S2412
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2365 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Reported by S2412
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S308.pdf |