MA S341 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create an Educational Unfunded Mandate Task Force. Education.
Title
Relative to the creation of a Educational Unfunded Mandate Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] |
Rep. James Kelcourse [R] | Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H501 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3851 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - New draft substituted, see H4256
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H557 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H501 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3851 (Similar To) 2019-12-19 - New draft substituted, see H4256
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S341 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S341.pdf |