MA S401 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2544

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to corporations, shareholders, and political expenditures. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to corporations, shareholders, and political expenditures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2544
2019-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-05-03JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-05-02JointHearing rescheduled to 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-04-29JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H640 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H85 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file
S393 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1775 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S545 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S418 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback