MA S408 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to support working parents who choose to run for public office. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting parents running for public office

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseHouse concurred
2020-03-09SenateReporting date extended to Monday, June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-24SenateRecommitted to the committee on Election Laws
2020-02-24SenateRules suspended
2020-02-24SenateOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2019-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-05-03JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-05-02JointHearing rescheduled to 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-04-29JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S1311 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2449 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H639 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Recommitted to the committee on Election Laws
H81 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, May 13, 2020
S67 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2417 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied S1674
S1674 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1737 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback