MA S420 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections. Election Laws.
Title
Providing a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2544 |
2019-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S382 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H707 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H692 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S389 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H719 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H635 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H643 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
H707 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H692 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S389 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H719 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H635 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H643 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S420 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S420.pdf |