MA S436 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the establishment of recycling programs for ionization smoke detectors. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Requiring the establishment of recycling programs for ionization smoke detectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2540 |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H796 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S494 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H796 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2540 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S436.pdf |