MA S463 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H763
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Accompanied H763
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Accompanied H763
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect pollinators by eliminating harmful products. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Protecting pollinators by eliminating harmful products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | House | Accompanied H763 |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S447 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S432 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H776 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5072
H763 (Replaced by) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S432 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H776 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5072
H763 (Replaced by) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S463 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S463.pdf |