MA S486 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect public and private woodlands and woodlots in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect public and private woodlands and woodlots in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H900 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1
H878 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - Accompanied H876
H728 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S520 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S1340 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1113 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H332 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1981 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S893 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H849 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2313 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2341 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback