MA S494 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an investigation and study of enhancing statewide recycling programs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study of enhancing statewide recycling programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Accompanied S520 |
2019-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H796 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H797 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S470 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H796 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H797 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S494 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S494.pdf |