MA S549 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2543

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to women’s health. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to women’s health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2543
2019-09-30JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H2394 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H901 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H903 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1115 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1116 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S613 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1006 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3746 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback