MA S620 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2543
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the fiduciary responsibility of lenders for non-payment of insurance premiums from escrowed accounts. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the fiduciary responsibility of lenders for non-payment of insurance premiums from escrowed accounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2543 |
2019-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3653 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S620 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S620.pdf |