MA S636 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize independent retirement boards to divest from fossil fuel companies. Financial Services.
Title
Authorizing independent retirement boards to divest from fossil fuel companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4440 |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-06-27 | House | House concurred |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2172 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2235 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2204 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1527 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4440 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2235 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2204 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1527 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4440 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S636 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S636.pdf |