MA S669 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make a technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for Patient Safety and Medical Error Reduction enabling statute. Health Care Financing.
Title
Making technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for Patient Safety and Medical Error Reduction enabling statute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1213 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1127 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1255 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1235 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2433
S843 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3388
H2004 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
S2433 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2843
H1127 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1255 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1235 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2433
S843 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3388
H2004 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
S2433 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2843
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S669 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S669.pdf |