MA S682 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase access to urgent care centers. Health Care Financing.
Title
To increase access to urgent care centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S682 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S682.pdf |