MA S756 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2539
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities. Higher Education.
Title
Creating higher education opportunities for students with intellectual disabilities, autism, and other developmental disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2539 |
2019-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H481 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1208 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H8 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H1241 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1219 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S750 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2539 (Replaced by) 2020-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2844
H1208 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H8 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H1241 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1219 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S750 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2539 (Replaced by) 2020-07-28 - New draft substituted, see S2844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S756 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S756.pdf |