MA S77 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2905
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2905
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2905
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parentage to promote children's security. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to parentage to promote children's security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2905 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday September 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 18, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2241 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2011 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S918 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1242 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2686
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2905 (Replaced by) 2020-09-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2241 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2011 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S918 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1242 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2686
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2905 (Replaced by) 2020-09-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S77 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S77.pdf |