MA S846 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to probation violations. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to probation violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2960 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1521 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S837 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3297 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S907 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3391 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1330 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1521 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S837 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3297 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S907 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S846 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S846.pdf |