MA S960 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1413
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase transparency in the Massachusetts land record systems to protect the property rights of homeowners and businesses. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase transparency in the Massachusetts land record systems to protect the property rights of homeowners and businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Accompanied H1413 |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1062 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H1413 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1062 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H1413 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S960 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S960.pdf |