MA S983 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2953
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2953 |
2020-10-26 | House | House concurred |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3406 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H172 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4349
S910 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1487 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
S2953 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H172 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4349
S910 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1487 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
S2953 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S983 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S983.pdf |