MD HB10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Highway Administration to repair and maintain certain sidewalks that are located within an area designated as a priority funding area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Highway Administration – Sidewalks Within Priority Funding Areas – Repair and Maintenance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-10-17HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback