MD HB1000 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include a certain amount in the annual State budget for each county board of education to support the maintenance of school buildings and equipment; requiring a certain appropriation to be in addition to any other State funds provided to the county board in a certain fiscal year; and requiring each county board to use certain funds only for the maintenance of school buildings and equipment.
Title
School Maintenance Incentive Funding Act of 2019
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] |
Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2019-02-27 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Construction
Education, Boards of
Equipment
Governor
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes
Budgets
Construction
Education, Boards of
Equipment
Governor
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes