MD HB1001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the entities required to submit a certain report relating to restrictive housing; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to compile and summarize certain information from each correctional unit in a report to the General Assembly; prohibiting a correctional unit from placing a minor in restrictive housing unless there is clear and convincing evidence that certain conditions exist; requiring that a minor in restrictive housing be provided certain conditions and privileges; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Reporting by Correctional Units and Requirements Relating to Minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-18) (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-18) (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-18) |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senators Hough, Washington, and Waldstreicher |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-04 | House | Delegates Moon, D.M. Davis, and Malone |
2019-04-04 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-04 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2019-04-04 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {288978/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-3) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {432719/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Court Costs
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Electronic Government
internet
Juvenile Causes
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Safety
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Court Costs
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Electronic Government
internet
Juvenile Causes
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Safety