MD HB1003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the administration and management of the Telecommunications Access of Maryland and Telecommunications Devices and Distribution of Accessible Information for Disabled Individuals programs from the Department of Information Technology to the Department of Disabilities; requiring the Department of Disabilities to provide staff, including a director, to the Governor's Advisory Board for Telecommunications Relay; etc.
Title
Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Sponsors
Del. Erek Barron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB851 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Information Technology, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Libraries
Mobile Devices
News Media
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Information Technology, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Libraries
Mobile Devices
News Media
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones