MD HB1008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to use a fair market value determined in accordance with certain provisions of law for up to 2 years after the date on which the Foundation was first requested in writing to purchase the easement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback