MD HB1010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the holder of a Class 5 brewery license to brew and bottle malt beverages at a location listed on an individual storage permit; authorizing a local licensing board to conditionally grant an applicant an on-site consumption permit or a Class D beer license that will become effective after the applicant meets certain requirements; authorizing a holder of a micro-brewery license to hold another license; altering the amount of beer that certain manufacturers may sell at retail; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brewery Modernization Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {454134/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-20SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (133-1)
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {553195/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1010&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1010f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1010t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1010e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_317_hb1010e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1010_55319502.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb1010_45413401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb1010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0879.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1010_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1158.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1418.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback