MD HB1012 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring individuals convicted of child abuse to register with a certain supervising authority by a certain time and to register annually with a local law enforcement unit for a certain term; requiring a certain registration to include a digital image that shall be updated at least once each year; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a State child abuse registry and to provide certain information on the Internet; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Child Abuse Registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Identification
Liability
Names
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Government
Identification
Liability
Names
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Public Officials
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Residency
Rules and Regulations