MD HB1014 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a certain summary of election law prepared by the State Board of Elections address compliance and reporting requirements for campaign finance entities and certain persons; altering the definition of "donation" for certain provisions of law requiring that certain persons disclose donations in certain reports filed with the State Board to include only donations that the donor and certain persons agree may be used for certain political purposes; etc.
Title
Campaign Finance - Disclosure of Donations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Nick Mosby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2019-03-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Forms
Gifts
Notices
Political Committees
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Communications
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Forms
Gifts
Notices
Political Committees
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes