MD HB102 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the frequency with which specified payments from a special fund are required to be paid; requiring the reduction of specified grants and payments under specified circumstances; providing that a specified District Court surcharge shall be added to fines imposed for specified traffic cases and not to court costs; providing that specified regulations and licensing requirements of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission supersede specified county fees or regulations and licensing requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-6) (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-36) (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Kasemeyer) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-36) (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McMillan) {833225/1 Rejected (44-89) (Y: 44 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425
2013-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2013-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (39-6)
2013-04-05SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2013-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (103-36)
2013-04-05HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2013-04-04HouseSpecial Order until 4/5 (Delegate Conway) Adopted
2013-03-25Senate(Senators McFadden, Robey, Edwards and Peters)
2013-03-25SenateSenate advisors:
2013-03-25SenateSenators Kasemeyer, Jones-Rodwell, DeGrange, Madaleno, and Brinkley
2013-03-25SenateConference Committee Appointed
2013-03-25SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2013-03-22House(Delegates Proctor, Jones, Haynes and Hixson)
2013-03-22HouseHouse advisors:
2013-03-22HouseDelegates Conway, Bohanan, Griffith, Guzzone, and Eckardt
2013-03-22HouseConference Committee Appointed
2013-03-22HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2013-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5)
2013-03-20SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted (47-0)
2013-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-20SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {603426/1 Adopted (#13)
2013-03-20SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) {233523/1 Rejected
2013-03-20SenateFloor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {269832/1 Adopted (#12)
2013-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2013-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#8-11) Adopted
2013-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#5-7) Adopted
2013-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted
2013-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {879732/1
2013-03-19SenateSpecial Order until 3/20 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2013-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {879732/1
2013-03-18SenateLaid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2013-03-19SenateMotion suspend rule 52(c)(1) (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2013-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {879732/1
2013-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2013-03-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2013-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (101-36)
2013-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-13HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {833225/1 Rejected (44-89)
2013-03-13HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate James) {103227/1 Adopted
2013-03-13HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {753122/1 Adopted
2013-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#10-14) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#9) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#8) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#7) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#6) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#6-9)
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#4-5) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#3) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#1-2) Adopted
2013-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#1-5)
2013-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {154869/1
2013-03-11HouseSpecial Order until 3/13 (Delegate Conway) Adopted
2013-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {154869/1
2013-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2013-02-26HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-16HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects

Abandoned Property
Administrative Agencies
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Appropriations
Arrests
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Campaign Financing
Child Care
Citations
Coal
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Corporations
Counties
District Courts
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Forms
Fuel
Gaming
General Services, Department of
Grants
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Historical Matters
Hospitals
Income Tax
Insurance
Interest
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Lottery
Medical Assistance
Minorities
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources, Department of
News Media
Notaries Public
Notices
Operating Budget
Planning, Department of
Prices
Private Schools
Property Tax
Public Information
Public Schools
Racing
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries
Small Business
Special Education
State Aid
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Tax Credits
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Utilities
Veterans
Women

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0102&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0102f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0102t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0102e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_425_hb0102e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_15486901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_10322701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_75312201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_83322501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_87973201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_23352301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_26983201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_60342601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_44352501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_26352901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0102.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0102_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0102_b&t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0102_26352901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,h-0327&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,h-0383&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,s-0618&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,s-0619&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,s-1068&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0102,h-1028&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback