MD HB102 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding the Secretary of Information Technology as a member of the Procurement Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement Advisory Council - Membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 82
2014-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2014-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-11SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-02-18HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2014-02-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-02-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-01-16HouseHearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2013-10-15HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback